House | 04/15/2014 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 04/09/2014 | File Number 472 | ||
House | 04/09/2014 | House Calendar Number 280 | ||
House | 04/09/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/09/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/03/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/24/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/07/2014 | Public Hearing 03/12 | ||
House | 03/06/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |