House | 06/11/2014 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/27/2014 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/27/2014 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/21/2014 | Public Act 14-177 | ||
House | 05/07/2014 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/07/2014 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/06/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 593 | ||
House | 05/06/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/06/2014 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 05/06/2014 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/17/2014 | File Number 633 | ||
House | 04/17/2014 | House Calendar Number 403 | ||
House | 04/17/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/17/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/11/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/02/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/02/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/27/2014 | Public Hearing 03/31 | ||
House | 03/06/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |