House | 05/02/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 05/02/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/02/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/29/2014 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | File Number 446 | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | House Calendar Number 262 | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/01/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/21/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/10/2014 | Public Hearing 03/14 | ||
House | 03/06/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |