House | 04/08/2014 | File Number 448 | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | House Calendar Number 257 | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/01/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/24/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/12/2014 | Public Hearing 03/17 | ||
House | 03/07/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |