Senate
|
06/13/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
Public Act 14-227
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5699
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
File Number 734
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 536
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2014
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2014
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4565
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2014
|
File Number 504
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2014
|
House Calendar Number 297
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2014
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2014
|
Public Hearing 03/17
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|