House
|
06/13/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2014
|
Special Act 14-23
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 589
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5557
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2014
|
File Number 535
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2014
|
House Calendar Number 343
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/14 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2014
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2014
|
Public Hearing 03/17
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|