House | 04/14/2014 | File Number 536 | ||
House | 04/14/2014 | House Calendar Number 344 | ||
House | 04/14/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/14/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/07/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/14 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/28/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/13/2014 | Public Hearing 03/17 | ||
House | 03/11/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |