Senate
|
06/03/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2014
|
Public Act 14-86
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2014
|
File Number 755
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 563
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2014
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4904
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2014
|
File Number 551
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2014
|
House Calendar Number 362
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2014
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2014
|
Public Hearing 03/17
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|