House | 04/28/2014 | File Number 695 | ||
House | 04/28/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 510 | ||
House | 04/28/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/24/2014 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 04/24/2014 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4049 | ||
House | 04/22/2014 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/22/2014 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 04/21/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/21/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/21/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/15/2014 | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 04/09/2014 | File Number 476 | ||
House | 04/09/2014 | House Calendar Number 284 | ||
House | 04/09/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/03/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/14/2014 | Public Hearing 03/19 | ||
House | 03/11/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |