House | 04/28/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 495 | ||
House | 04/28/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/25/2014 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/02/2014 | File Number 312 | ||
House | 04/02/2014 | House Calendar Number 192 | ||
House | 04/02/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/02/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/20/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/19/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/13/2014 | Public Hearing 03/17 | ||
House | 03/12/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |