Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Public Act 14-39
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2014
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2014
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2014
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2014
|
File Number 749
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 559
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2014
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2014
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 5134
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2014
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5194
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2014
|
File Number 711
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2014
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2014
|
New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2014
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2014
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2014
|
File Number 477
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2014
|
House Calendar Number 285
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2014
|
Public Hearing 03/17
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|