Connecticut 2014 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05565 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/11/2014

                            General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 5565
February Session, 2014  LCO No. 2604
 *02604_______ED_*
Referred to Committee on EDUCATION
Introduced by:
(ED)

General Assembly

Raised Bill No. 5565 

February Session, 2014

LCO No. 2604

*02604_______ED_*

Referred to Committee on EDUCATION 

Introduced by:

(ED)

AN ACT CONCERNING THE MINIMUM BUDGET REQUIREMENT.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

Section 1. Subsection (d) of section 10-262i of the 2014 supplement to the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2014):

(d) (1) Except as otherwise provided under the provisions of subdivisions (3) and (4) of this subsection, for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2014, the budgeted appropriation for education shall be not less than the budgeted appropriation for education for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2013, plus any aid increase described in subsection (e) of this section, except that a town may reduce its budgeted appropriation for education for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2014, by one of the following: (A) Any district with a resident student count for October 1, 2012, using the data of record as of January 31, 2013, that is lower than such district's resident student count for October 1, 2011, using the data of record as of January 31, 2013, may reduce such district's budgeted appropriation for education by the difference in number of resident students for such years multiplied by three thousand, provided such reduction shall not exceed one-half of one per cent of the district's budgeted appropriation for education for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2013, (B) any district that (i) does not maintain a high school and pays tuition to another school district pursuant to section 10-33 for resident students to attend high school in another district, and (ii) the number of resident students attending high school for such district for October 1, 2012, using the data of record as of January 31, 2013, is lower than such district's number of resident students attending high school for October 1, 2011, using the data of record as of January 31, 2013, may reduce such district's budgeted appropriation for education by the difference in number of resident students attending high school for such years multiplied by the tuition paid per student pursuant to section 10-33, or (C) any district that realizes new and documentable savings through increased intradistrict efficiencies approved by the Commissioner of Education or through regional collaboration or cooperative arrangements pursuant to section 10-158a may reduce such district's budgeted appropriation for education in an amount equal to half of the savings experienced as a result of such intradistrict efficiencies, regional collaboration or cooperative arrangement, provided such reduction shall not exceed one-half of one per cent of the district's budgeted appropriation for education for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2013.

(2) Except as otherwise provided under the provisions of subdivisions (3), [and] (5) and (7) of this subsection, for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2015, the budgeted appropriation for education shall be not less than the budgeted appropriation for education for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2014, plus any aid increase received pursuant to subsection (e) of this section, except that a town may reduce its budgeted appropriation for education for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2015, by one of the following: (A) Any district with a resident student count for October 1, 2013, using the data of record as of January 31, 2014, that is lower than such district's resident student count for October 1, 2012, using the data of record as of January 31, 2014, may reduce such district's budgeted appropriation for education by the difference in number of resident students for such years multiplied by three thousand, provided such reduction shall not exceed one-half of one per cent of the district's budgeted appropriation for education for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2014, (B) any district that (i) does not maintain a high school and pays tuition to another school district pursuant to section 10-33 for resident students to attend high school in another district, and (ii) the number of resident students attending high school for such district for October 1, 2013, using the data of record as of January 31, 2014, is lower than such district's number of resident students attending high school for October 1, 2012, using the data of record as of January 31, 2014, may reduce such district's budgeted appropriation for education by the difference in number of resident students attending high school for such years multiplied by the tuition paid per student pursuant to section 10-33, or (C) any district that realizes new and documentable savings through increased intradistrict efficiencies approved by the Commissioner of Education or through regional collaboration or cooperative arrangements pursuant to section 10-158a may reduce such district's budgeted appropriation for education in an amount equal to half of the savings experienced as a result of such intradistrict efficiencies, regional collaboration or cooperative arrangement, provided such reduction shall not exceed one-half of one per cent of the district's budgeted appropriation for education for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2013.

(3) The Commissioner of Education may permit a district to reduce its budgeted appropriation for education for the fiscal years ending June 30, 2014, and June 30, 2015, inclusive, in an amount determined by the commissioner if such district has permanently ceased operations and closed one or more schools in the district due to declining enrollment at such closed school or schools in the fiscal year ending June 30, 2011, June 30, 2012, or June 30, 2013.

(4) For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2014, the budgeted appropriation for a town designated as an alliance district, as defined in section 10-262u, shall be not less than the sum of (A) the budgeted appropriation for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2013, and (B) the amount necessary to meet the minimum local funding percentage, as defined in subdivision (39) of section 10-262f, except the commissioner may permit a town designated as an alliance district to reduce its budgeted appropriation for education if such town can demonstrate that its local contribution for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2014, has increased when compared to the local contribution used in determining its local funding percentage, as defined in subdivision (38) of section 10-262f.

(5) For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2015, the budgeted appropriation for a town designated as an alliance district, as defined in section 10-262u, shall be not less than the sum of (A) the budgeted appropriation for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2014, and (B) the amount necessary to meet the minimum local funding percentage, as defined in section 10-262f, except the commissioner may permit a town designated as an alliance district to reduce its budgeted appropriation for education if such town can demonstrate that its local contribution for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2015, has increased when compared to the local contribution used in determining its local funding percentage, as defined in section 10-262f.

(6) For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2015, any town whose budgeted appropriation for education includes an appropriation to a local school district and an appropriation to a regional school district shall not reduce its budgeted appropriation to the local school district by more than one-half of one per cent of the budgeted appropriation to the local school district for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2014, due to changes in the budgeted appropriation to the regional school district.

(7) For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2015, the budgeted appropriation for education for a district that reduced its budgeted appropriation for education by more than one-half of one per cent for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2014, shall be not less than the district's budgeted appropriation for education for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2013, plus any aid increase received pursuant to subsection (e) of this section.

 


This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
Section 1 July 1, 2014 10-262i(d)

This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:

Section 1

July 1, 2014

10-262i(d)

Statement of Purpose: 

To make revisions to the minimum budget requirement.

[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]