Senate | 05/01/2014 | File Number 735 | ||
Senate | 05/01/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 535 | ||
Senate | 05/01/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/30/2014 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 04/30/2014 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 04/30/2014 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4551 | ||
House | 04/10/2014 | File Number 506 | ||
House | 04/10/2014 | House Calendar Number 299 | ||
House | 04/10/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/10/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/04/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/25/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/13/2014 | Public Hearing 03/17 | ||
House | 03/12/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |