House | 04/24/2014 | File Number 675 | ||
House | 04/24/2014 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/24/2014 | New File by Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 04/24/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/17/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/16/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/15/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 04/03/2014 | File Number 360 | ||
House | 04/03/2014 | House Calendar Number 222 | ||
House | 04/03/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/28/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/20/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/14/2014 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
House | 03/13/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |