House | 05/03/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 570 | ||
House | 05/03/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/03/2014 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 05/03/2014 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/03/2014 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5225 | ||
House | 04/10/2014 | File Number 510 | ||
House | 04/10/2014 | House Calendar Number 303 | ||
House | 04/10/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/10/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/04/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/25/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/25/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/17/2014 | Public Hearing 03/21 | ||
House | 03/13/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |