House
|
06/13/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2014
|
Public Act 14-233
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 585
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5506
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2014
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2014
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2014
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2014
|
Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2014
|
File Number 596
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2014
|
House Calendar Number 388
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2014
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2014
|
Public Hearing 03/24
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|