House | 04/15/2014 | File Number 553 | ||
House | 04/15/2014 | House Calendar Number 364 | ||
House | 04/15/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/15/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/09/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/31/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/28/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/20/2014 | Public Hearing 03/24 | ||
House | 03/19/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |