Senate | 03/11/2014 | File Number 5 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 41 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/11/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/04/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/10/14 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/26/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/25/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/13/2014 | Public Hearing 02/18 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |