Senate | 02/27/2014 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 02/27/2014 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 02/26/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/26/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/25/2014 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 02/13/2014 | Public Hearing 02/18 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |