Senate | 03/31/2014 | File Number 181 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 160 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/31/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/24/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/14/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/13/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/13/2014 | Public Hearing 02/18 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |