Senate | 04/17/2014 | File Number 601 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 393 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/17/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/11/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/14 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/01/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/05/2014 | Public Hearing 03/14 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |