House
|
05/28/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2014
|
Public Act 14-41
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2014
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2014
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2014
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2014
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2014
|
File Number 750
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2014
|
Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2014
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2014
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5192
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2014
|
House Calendar Number 479
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2014
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule E 4388
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2014
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 4377
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2014
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 4381
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2014
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 4380
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2014
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4368
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2014
|
File Number 417
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 278
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2014
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2014
|
Public Hearing 03/03
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|