Senate | 04/29/2014 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/23/2014 | File Number 662 | ||
Senate | 04/23/2014 | New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/23/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/28/14 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/23/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/23/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/22/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/22/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 04/17/2014 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/10/2014 | File Number 478 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 302 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/14 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/27/2014 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |