Senate | 04/22/2014 | File Number 654 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 442 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/22/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/14/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/14 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 04/03/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/01/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/24/2014 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/21/2014 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/13/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |