Senate
|
06/03/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2014
|
Public Act 14-168
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
House Calendar Number 544
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 5690
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2014
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2014
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4106
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2014
|
File Number 419
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 286
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2014
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2014
|
Public Hearing 03/05
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|