Senate | 05/28/2014 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/14/2014 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/14/2014 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/12/2014 | Special Act 14-10 | ||
Senate | 05/06/2014 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/06/2014 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2014 | House Calendar Number 311 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/09/2014 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2014 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/25/2014 | File Number 102 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 106 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/25/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/18/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/14 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/13/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/12/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/18/2014 | Public Hearing 02/24 | ||
Senate | 02/18/2014 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |