Senate | 04/24/2014 | House Calendar Number 436 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/22/2014 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2014 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/16/2014 | File Number 561 | ||
Senate | 04/16/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 389 | ||
Senate | 04/16/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/16/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/10/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/14 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/01/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/17/2014 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/17/2014 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/12/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/28/2014 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
Senate | 02/10/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |