Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2014
|
Public Act 14-9
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2014
|
House Calendar Number 410
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2014
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2014
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3625
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
No New File by Committee on Banks
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2014
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2014
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Banks
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2014
|
File Number 27
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 67
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/17/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2014
|
Public Hearing 02/18
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|