Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2014
|
Public Act 14-170
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
House Calendar Number 542
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5590
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
Matter Pass Retained
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2014
|
Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2014
|
File Number 34
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 59
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/17/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2014
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2014
|
Public Hearing 02/19
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|