Senate | 04/16/2014 | File Number 562 | ||
Senate | 04/16/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 390 | ||
Senate | 04/16/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/16/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/10/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/14 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/17/2014 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/17/2014 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/11/2014 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/28/2014 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
Senate | 02/25/2014 | Drafted by Committee |