Senate | 05/16/2014 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/08/2014 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/08/2014 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/07/2014 | Public Act 14-22 | ||
Senate | 05/01/2014 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/01/2014 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2014 | House Calendar Number 315 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/09/2014 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2014 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | File Number 268 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 201 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/27/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/14 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/18/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/18/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/13/2014 | Public Hearing 02/18 | ||
Senate | 02/11/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |