Senate | 04/29/2014 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/29/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/28/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/28/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/28/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/23/2014 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/23/2014 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 04/23/2014 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
Senate | 04/17/2014 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
Senate | 04/07/2014 | File Number 370 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 263 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/20/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/14/2014 | Public Hearing 02/20 | ||
Senate | 02/13/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |