Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2014
|
Public Act 14-172
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2014
|
House Calendar Number 509
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5157
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
No New File by Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2014
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2014
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2014
|
No New File by Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2014
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2014
|
File Number 315
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 231
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2014
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2014
|
Public Hearing 02/20
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
|
|
|