Senate | 04/19/2014 | House Calendar Number 413 | ||
Senate | 04/19/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/17/2014 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2014 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/25/2014 | File Number 107 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 110 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/25/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/18/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/14 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/11/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/10/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/24/2014 | Public Hearing 02/28 | ||
Senate | 02/13/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |