Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2014
|
Public Act 14-173
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5454
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2014
|
House Calendar Number 510
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
No New File by Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2014
|
File Number 607
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 399
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2014
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
Public Hearing 02/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|