Senate | 04/23/2014 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | No New File by Committee on Banks | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/01/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/01/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/26/2014 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Banks | ||
Senate | 03/19/2014 | File Number 59 | ||
Senate | 03/19/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 79 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/14 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/06/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
Senate | 02/19/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |