Senate | 04/24/2014 | No New File by Committee on General Law | ||
Senate | 04/24/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/24/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/24/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/24/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/22/2014 | Referred by Senate to Committee on General Law | ||
Senate | 04/16/2014 | No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
Senate | 04/08/2014 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
Senate | 03/27/2014 | File Number 171 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 135 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/14 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/11/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Public Hearing 02/25 | ||
Senate | 02/20/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |