Senate | 06/06/2014 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/22/2014 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/21/2014 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/16/2014 | Public Act 14-109 | ||
Senate | 05/07/2014 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/07/2014 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/07/2014 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/25/2014 | House Calendar Number 455 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/23/2014 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2014 | No New File by Committee on Banks | ||
Senate | 04/14/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/11/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/11/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/11/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/08/2014 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Banks | ||
Senate | 03/25/2014 | File Number 115 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 105 | ||
Senate | 03/18/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/14 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
Senate | 02/20/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |