Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
Public Act 14-69
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
House Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2014
|
House Calendar Number 471
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2014
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2014
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2014
|
File Number 124
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 119
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2014
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Public Hearing 02/27
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|