Senate | 04/09/2014 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Energy and Technology | ||
Senate | 03/26/2014 | File Number 126 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 121 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/26/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/20/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/14 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/10/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/07/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/24/2014 | Public Hearing 02/28 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |