Senate
|
06/12/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2014
|
Public Act 14-201
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
House Calendar Number 325
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2014
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2014
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3454
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2014
|
File Number 66
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 71
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2014
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Public Hearing 02/28
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|