Senate | 04/29/2014 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/29/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/28/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/28/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/28/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/24/2014 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/24/2014 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3592 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | File Number 276 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 216 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/14 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/03/2014 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |