Senate | 04/24/2014 | Motion Failed JF | ||
Senate | 04/22/2014 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 04/17/2014 | File Number 609 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 401 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/17/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/11/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/14 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/07/2014 | Public Hearing 03/12 | ||
Senate | 02/25/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |