Senate
|
06/13/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Public Act 14-204
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2014
|
House Calendar Number 424
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2014
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2014
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3829
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2014
|
File Number 127
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 122
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2014
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2014
|
Public Hearing 03/05
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|