Senate | 04/29/2014 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Veterans' Affairs | ||
Senate | 04/22/2014 | File Number 655 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 443 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/22/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/14/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/14 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 04/03/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/01/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/17/2014 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/17/2014 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/12/2014 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 02/28/2014 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
Senate | 02/25/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |