Senate | 06/06/2014 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/23/2014 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/23/2014 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/19/2014 | Public Act 14-112 | ||
Senate | 05/07/2014 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/07/2014 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/07/2014 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2014 | House Calendar Number 425 | ||
Senate | 04/19/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/17/2014 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2014 | File Number 224 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 177 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/01/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/25/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/18/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/14/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/27/2014 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |