Senate | 04/09/2014 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Banks | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | File Number 277 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 208 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/27/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/14 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/20/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/20/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/28/2014 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |