Senate
|
06/06/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Public Act 14-114
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
House Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
House Calendar Number 545
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2014
|
Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2014
|
No New File by Committee on General Law
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2014
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on General Law
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2014
|
File Number 176
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 140
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2014
|
Public Hearing 03/04
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
|
|
|