Senate | 04/17/2014 | No New File by Committee on Transportation | ||
Senate | 04/17/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/16/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/16/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/16/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/09/2014 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Transportation | ||
Senate | 04/01/2014 | File Number 228 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 170 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/17/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/03/2014 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |