Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
House Calendar Number 487
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2014
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B,C
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2014
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule C 4785
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2014
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 4579
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2014
|
No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2014
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2014
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2014
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3774
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2014
|
File Number 423
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 280
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2014
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2014
|
Public Hearing 03/07
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|